Global Patent Index - EP 1845207 A1

EP 1845207 A1 2007-10-17 - Drinking water system and method for operating such a system

Title (en)

Drinking water system and method for operating such a system

Title (de)

Trinkwassersystem sowie Verfahren zum Betrieb eines solchen Systems

Title (fr)

Système d'eau potable tout comme son procédé de fonctionnement

Publication

EP 1845207 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07007597 A

Priority

DE 102006017807 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a transfer point of a public drinking water supply net, and a floor line and/or a riser line (2) and a set of closed circular pipes (10), where the pipes are guided to a tapping point (12) and arranged in series in an extension direction of the line. The circular pipes exit in the riser line and discharge in the line in the flow direction of the line. A controllable valve produces a rinsing current in the line in an opened condition, such that water in the line is exchanged and discharged into a sewage disposal network. An independent claim is also included for a method for operating a drinking or an industrial water system.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Trink- oder Brauchwassersystem mit einer Übergabestelle (22) aus einem öffentlichen Trinkwasser-Versorgungsnetz und wenigstens einem Stockwerks- bzw. Steigrohrstrang (2) sowie mehreren in Erstreckungsrichtung des Stranges (2) hintereinander angeordneten und jeweils zu wenigstens einem Verbraucher (12) führenden Ringleitungen (10), die von dem Strang (2) abgehen und in Strömungsrichtung des Stranges dahinter in den Strang münden. Die vorliegende Erfindung begegnet dem Problem einer möglichen Verkeimung des Trinkwassersystems dadurch, dass dem Strang ein steuerbares Ventil (28) zugeordnet ist, das im geöffneten Zustand eine eine Spülströmung in der Ringleitung (10) bewirkende Strömung in dem Strang erzeugt und das Trink- oder Brauchwassersystem mit einer Abgabestelle (32) für verbrauchtes Wasser an das öffentliche Abwasserentsorgungsnetz verbindet. Gemäß einem nebengeordneten Aspekt sind die Ringleitungen (10) und/oder der Abzweig (14) bzw. die Mündung (16) der jeweiligen Ringleitung (10) am Strang derart ausgebildet, dass bei Entnahme von Trink- oder Brauchwasser an einem an dem Strang (2) angeschlossenen Verbraucher (12) durch eine Strömung in dem Strang zwischen dem Abzweig (14) und der Mündung (16) einer in Strömungsrichtung dem Verbraucher (12) vorgelagerten Ringleitung (10) des Stranges (2) eine Druckdifferenz erzeugt wird, durch welche in den vorgelagerten Ringleitungen (10) eine Spülströmung erzeugt wird. Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ferner ein Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Trink- oder Brauchwassersystems, bei dem durch Betätigen eines Verbrauchers (12) eine die Spülströmung in der strömungsmäßig vorgelagerten Ringleitung (10) bewirkende Druckdifferenz erzeugt wird. Gemäß einem alternativen Aspekt wird durch Öffnen eines am Ende eines Stranges vorgesehenen steuerbaren Ventils (28) in dem Abzweig (14) eine Strömung erzeugt, welche eine Druckdifferenz zu jeder Ringleitung (10) ausbildet. (Fig. 3)

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03B 7/04 (2006.01); E03B 7/09 (2006.01); F24D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03B 7/09 (2013.01); E03B 7/045 (2013.01); F24D 17/00 (2013.01); F24D 17/0073 (2013.01); F24D 17/0078 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

BOGER G.A. ET AL: "Beuth-Kommentare", vol. TEIL 6, 1989, BEUTH VERLAG GMBH, BERLIN, KÖLN, article "Kommentar zu DIN 1988 Teile 1 bis 8, Technische Regeln für Trinkwasser-Installationen (TRWI)", XP003023649

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845207 A1 20071017; EP 1845207 B1 20160511; DE 102006017807 A1 20071018; DE 102006017807 B4 20131024; DK 1887150 T3 20161219; DK 2264251 T3 20161107; EP 1887150 A2 20080213; EP 1887150 A3 20130306; EP 1887150 B1 20160914; EP 2264251 A2 20101222; EP 2264251 A3 20130306; EP 2264251 B1 20160824; PL 1845207 T3 20161130; PL 1887150 T3 20170531; PL 2264251 T3 20170831; SI 1845207 T1 20160729; SI 2264251 T1 20161130

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-12-06 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 502007014799

2017-12-06 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 502007014799

2017-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160511

2017-09-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170404

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170403

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170214

2017-02-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007014799

2017-01-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160511

2017-01-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160511

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160511

2016-12-01 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 21595

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160912

2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160511

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160812

2016-11-30 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160511

2016-10-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160511

2016-09-12 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2016-08-17 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2016-08-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2016-08-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20160801

2016-06-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007014799

2016-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2016-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 798796 T

- Effective date: 20160515

2016-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2016-05-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG, CH

2016-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2015-12-23 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151124

2013-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130208

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071122

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU