Global Patent Index - EP 1845210 A2

EP 1845210 A2 2007-10-17 - Shaft assembly with throttle valve

Title (en)

Shaft assembly with throttle valve

Title (de)

Schachtanordnung mit Drossel

Title (fr)

Commutateur avec restricteur de débit

Publication

EP 1845210 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07007394 A

Priority

DE 202006006098 U

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a regulating device (2) connected with an inlet (3), where liquid level in the regulating device and/or a base unit (1) is constant. The regulating device is formed in such a manner that the liquid level in the base unit exceeds a given value. The regulating device partly locks the inlet. The regulating device has a discharge opening and a shut-off unit (10), where a throttle unit (9) is arranged in the discharge opening.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schachtanordnung (1) zur Regulierung des Wasserabflusses aus Versickerungsanlagen, Rigolen und dergleichen, mit einem Basiselement, einer Regulierungseinrichtung (2), einem Drosselelement (9) sowie wenigstens einem Zulauf (3) und einem Ablauf (4). Die Aufgabe der Erfindung besteht darin, die Nachteile des bekannten Standes der Technik zu überwinden und eine Schachtanordnung aufzuzeigen, die wirtschaftlich und kostengünstig herstellbar ist, die einfach und leicht montierbar ist und die einen konstant abfließenden, beeinflussbaren Volumenstrom auch bei schwankenden Einstauhöhen der Versickerungsanlagen, Rigolen und dergleichen abgibt. Erfindungsgemäß wird dies dadurch gelöst, dass die Regulierungseinrichtung (2) mit dem Zulauf (3) in Wirkverbindung steht und das Flüssigkeitsniveau in der Regulierungseinrichtung und/oder dem Basiselement im Wesentlichen konstant hält.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/10 (2006.01); E03F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/107 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006006098 U1 20070830; EP 1845210 A2 20071017; EP 1845210 A3 20071219

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080620

2008-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU