Global Patent Index - EP 1845211 A2

EP 1845211 A2 2007-10-17 - Assembly for mounting a roller projection screen in a suspended ceiling

Title (en)

Assembly for mounting a roller projection screen in a suspended ceiling

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Befestigung einer Rolleinwand in einer aufgehängten Decke

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un écran de projection dans un plafond suspendu

Publication

EP 1845211 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07007371 A

Priority

DE 202006006150 U

Abstract (en)

An elongate mounting housing (1) in the ceiling is substantially larger than an inner housing (10) accommodating the roller screen and driver motor. The mounting housing has a profile piece at each end with horizontal limbs. The outer ends of the inner housing have respective downward facing protrusions (11) which are sported on the horizontal limbs of the profile pieces.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Anordnung zur Befestigung einer Rollleinwand in einer aus einem an einem tragenden Bauteil aufgehängten, gitterartigen und Deckenplatten aufnehmenden Rahmen gebildeten Decke, bestehend aus einem an dem tragenden Bauteil anschließbaren und in die Decke einsetzbaren, länglichen Einbaugehäuse (1) und einem darin befestigbaren Innengehäuse (10) mit integrierter Rollleinwand und Antriebsmotor. Das Einbaugehäuse (1) ist nennenswert größer als das Innengehäuse (10) ausgebildet das in seinem unteren Bereich jeweils mit Abstand von seinen beiden Stirnflächen jeweils ein Profilstück mit jeweils der Stirnfläche zugewandtem, horizontalem Schenkel besitzt, wobei die äußeren Stirnflächen des Innengehäuses (10) einen nach unten gerichteten und sich auf dem horizontalen Schenkel des Profilstückes abstützenden Vorsprung (11) aufweisen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006006150 U1 20060622; EP 1845211 A2 20071017; EP 1845211 A3 20110420

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-02-16 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20111228

2011-12-28 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2011-12-28 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-04-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2011-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 9/00 20060101AFI20110311BHEP

2009-11-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OPTITEC GMBH & CO. KG

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU