Global Patent Index - EP 1845213 A2

EP 1845213 A2 2007-10-17 - Linking device between masonry and a metallic bearing structure

Title (en)

Linking device between masonry and a metallic bearing structure

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verbindung zwischen einem Mauerwerk und einer metallischen tragenden Struktur

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaison entre une maçonnerie et une structure porteuse métallique

Publication

EP 1845213 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07106078 A

Priority

US 79170706 P

Abstract (en)

The hook (10) has a section made of steel and with a portion fixed to a metallic carrier structure of a building and a portion inserted in a masonry (10). The former portion has ends at a mutual distance less than the thickness of a fin of a column (9) on which the hook is fixed. The ends are folded in a non-perpendicular manner with respect to parts of the latter portion so that the ends have same orientation in a non deformed state of the hook. The section is designed such that the fixation of the latter portion to the carrier structure is made by elastic deformation of the section.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention se rapporte à un dispositif tel que décrit dans les revendications. Il s'agit essentiellement d'un crochet de maçonnerie dont la forme et la pose provoquent un effet de ressort grâce à l'élasticité même du matériau constitutif du crochet, permettant la fixation simple et économique à la structure porteuse du bâtiment.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/4178 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845213 A2 20071017; EP 1845213 A3 20090520

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091121

2010-03-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU