Global Patent Index - EP 1845218 A2

EP 1845218 A2 2007-10-17 - Motorised blind and method of controlling such a blind

Title (en)

Motorised blind and method of controlling such a blind

Title (de)

Motorbetriebene Jalousie und Verfahren zur Steuerung einer solchen

Title (fr)

Installation de store motorisée et procédé de commande d'une telle installation

Publication

EP 1845218 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07356050 A

Priority

FR 0603353 A

Abstract (en)

The installation (I) has a winding tube (1) arranged inside a box (2) that is fixed on a wall of a building (B) and including a driving actuator (6) that drives in rotation with the tube. A striking bar (5) is supported by folded and articulated arms (4), and a blind fabric (3) is integrated from the bar and is selectively wound on the tube. An electromechanical locking device (11) locks the arms in different positions corresponding to partial or total deployment of a flat roof blind. A solar panel (8) electrically supplies the actuator of the tube. An independent claim is also included for a method of controlling a motorized blind installation.

Abstract (fr)

Cette installation (I) de store motorisé comprend un tube d'enroulement (1), dans lequel est disposé un actionneur (6) d'entraînement en rotation de ce tube, et une barre de charge (5) supportée par des bras articulés (4). Une toile de store (3) est solidaire de la barre de charge (5) et apte à être sélectivement enroulée sur le tube d'enroulement (1). Il est prévu des moyens (11) de verrouillage d'au moins un des bras articulés (4) dans plusieurs positions correspondant au déploiement total ou partiel du store. Ceci permet de bloquer les bras (4) en configuration déployée et de tendre la toile lors d'un arrêt du store.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/0618 (2013.01); E04F 10/0651 (2013.01); E04F 10/0648 (2013.01); E04F 10/0659 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845218 A2 20071017; EP 1845218 A3 20071114; FR 2899924 A1 20071019; US 2007240832 A1 20071018

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090318

2008-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080324

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU