Global Patent Index - EP 1845318 A3

EP 1845318 A3 2009-02-25 - Method for monitoring a flow safety device

Title (en)

Method for monitoring a flow safety device

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Überwachung einer Strömungssicherung

Title (fr)

Procédé de surveillance d'un dispositif de sécurité à écoulement

Publication

EP 1845318 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07006941 A

Priority

AT 6132006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1845318A2] The method involves regulating a flow control via an upper exhaust collector (7), a lower exhaust collector (2), a guide plate, a lateral opening (6) and a baffle (4). A temperature sensor (8) is arranged in the upper exhaust collector and above the baffle found in a lateral opening in a side turned away from a setting up space. The temperature of the heater detected by the sensor is cut off during operation of the heater when the temperature falls below a certain temperature difference. An independent claim is also included for a flow control for heaters.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/205 (2013.01); F23M 9/006 (2013.01); F23N 5/242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] GB 2076574 A 19811202 - VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845318 A2 20071017; EP 1845318 A3 20090225; AT 503132 A4 20070815; AT 503132 B1 20070815; DE 102007015962 A1 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20171207

2016-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160429

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090714

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU