Global Patent Index - EP 1845344 A2

EP 1845344 A2 2007-10-17 - Thermal flow meter for an exhaust gas recirculation system

Title (en)

Thermal flow meter for an exhaust gas recirculation system

Title (de)

Thermischer Durchflussmesser für ein Abgasrückführungssystem

Title (fr)

Débitmètre thermique pour un système de recirculation de gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1845344 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07007641 A

Priority

JP 2006110422 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a high-accuracy EGR sensor, and EGR system which adopts the above sensor to measure EGR rate. The gas flow meter (7) comprises a sensor section for measuring fluid flow rate and controller for controlling signals transmitted into and out of the sensor section, and is controlled at a working temperature of 350 to 700°C, wherein a protective coat (3) formed on the sensor section has resistance to temperature at which deposition of a PM component in exhaust gases can be prevented.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 1/688 (2006.01); F02D 41/18 (2006.01); G01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01F 1/688 (2013.01); G01F 1/684 (2013.01); G01F 15/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845344 A2 20071017; EP 1845344 A3 20090211; JP 2007285738 A 20071101; JP 5010845 B2 20120829; US 2007245822 A1 20071025; US 7526955 B2 20090505

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151103

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090327

2009-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090227

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU