Global Patent Index - EP 1845424 A2

EP 1845424 A2 2007-10-17 - Time counting assembly with a display for world time zones

Title (en)

Time counting assembly with a display for world time zones

Title (de)

Zeitmessgerät mit Anzeige für Weltzeitzonen

Title (fr)

Instrument de mesure du temps doté d'un affichage des fuseaux horaires mondiaux

Publication

EP 1845424 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07106084 A

Priority

  • CN 200610075120 A
  • CN 200710079235 A

Abstract (en)

A time counting assembly with a display for world time zones comprised of a power source (1), a second counter (2), a minute counter (3), an hour counter (4), and a time zone display (5) for displaying a correct time over a faceplate (53). The user stirs the time zone adjustable ring (52) with the hand to align a first landmark of a local time zone with a fixed point and then calibrates the time counting assembly in accordance with the local time, and then stirs the time zone adjustable ring (52) with the hand to align a second landmark of another locating time zone with the fixed point such that the inner gear ring (522) moves the planetary idle gear set and the planetary base wheel to shift engagement of the engaging hooks (56) in the ratchet holes (523), and the front hour wheel (41) is rotated on the planetary base wheel with a planetary movement along the minute wheel set (32) to cause rotation of a meshed hour wheel (42) so as to turn a hour hand (43) to the time in accordance with the time zone corresponding to the second landmark. The direct time zone adjustment design greatly reduces the thickness of the assembly so that the time counting assembly is usable in a watch or low-profile timer while maintaining world time zone display and adjustable functions, and providing a modularized design function for ultra-thin time recording device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/22 (2006.01); G04C 9/00 (2006.01); G04G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 9/0076 (2013.01); G04B 19/223 (2013.01); G04C 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845424 A2 20071017; EP 1845424 A3 20100908

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130705

2012-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120329

2011-05-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-04-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20110307

2010-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU