Global Patent Index - EP 1845521 A1

EP 1845521 A1 2007-10-17 - System for movie dubbing

Title (en)

System for movie dubbing

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Dubbing einem Film

Title (fr)

Système de doublage de film

Publication

EP 1845521 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07105937 A

Priority

FR 0651300 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a displaying unit e.g. television, for displaying a sequence of images or video sequence, and lip-sync band containing a text of cues and marks, on a screen simultaneously, where the marks permits the synchronization of the cues with respect to the images. A voice transformation and synthesizing engine restores an intelligible sound signal from the lip-sync band for forming dubbed cue. A adjusting unit re-edits a word of each cue according to the band.

Abstract (fr)

Système de doublage de film comprenant des moyens d'affichage permettant d'afficher en parallèle sur au moins un écran des images et au moins une bande rythmo contenant le texte des répliques et des repères aptes à permettre une synchronisation des répliques par rapport aux images, ledit système comportant en outre un moteur de synthèse et de transformation vocale apte à restituer un signal sonore intelligible à partir de ladite bande rythmo pour former des répliques doublées.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/06 (2006.01); G06T 15/70 (2006.01); G10L 13/04 (2006.01); G10L 21/10 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/00 (2013.01); G10L 2021/105 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845521 A1 20071017; FR 2899714 A1 20071012; FR 2899714 B1 20080704

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111118

2008-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080611

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080414

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU