Global Patent Index - EP 1845534 A1

EP 1845534 A1 2007-10-17 - Switching resistance for a high voltage switch

Title (en)

Switching resistance for a high voltage switch

Title (de)

Schaltwiderstand für einen Hochspannungsleitungsschalter

Title (fr)

Résistance de commutation pour un commutateur de puissance haute tension

Publication

EP 1845534 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07105213 A

Priority

DE 102006017218 A

Abstract (en)

The resistor has a resistor section formed by a metal wire (17) and exhibiting ohmic resistance, where the metal wire is spirally wound around a coil axis (A). A coil possesses disk-like coil sections (19a-19c) wound in a form of archimedean spirals and adjacent in direction of the coil axis, where the archimedean spirals are connected with each other. A pin extends along the coil axis, and disk-shaped support bodies are attached with the pin.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Schaltwiderstand (10) für Hochspannungsleistungsschalter zur Verfügung gestellt, welcher mit einer einen ohmschen Widerstand aufweisenden und durch einen Metalldraht (17) gebildeten Widerstandsstrecke ausgestattet ist. Der Metalldraht (17) ist spiralförmig um eine Wicklungsachse (A) gewickelt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 3/14 (2006.01); H01H 33/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 3/18 (2013.01); H01C 10/50 (2013.01); H01H 33/165 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 1921604 U 19650819 - LICENTIA GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845534 A1 20071017; EP 1845534 B1 20090506; DE 102006017218 A1 20071025; DE 502007000681 D1 20090618

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502007000681

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110308

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 4

2010-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100209

2009-08-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007000681 P 20090618

2009-05-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2009-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE

2008-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080521

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080415

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU