Global Patent Index - EP 1845547 A2

EP 1845547 A2 2007-10-17 - Bistable manoeuvring device of a mobile shaft and battery cutout comprising such a device

Title (en)

Bistable manoeuvring device of a mobile shaft and battery cutout comprising such a device

Title (de)

Bistabile Stellvorrichtung einer beweglichen Welle und Batteriestromunterbrecher mit einer solchen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de manoeuvre bistable d'un arbre mobile et coupe-circuit de batterie comprenant un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 1845547 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07290424 A

Priority

FR 0603191 A

Abstract (en)

The device (100) has a core (30) made of a magnetic material and movably mounted in a frame (10). A displacement unit displaces the core in translation from a rear flange (40) to a front flange (90), and includes a bobbin (80) surrounding the core that is supplied by electric current for generating a magnetic field that produces tensile force of the core. A movable shaft (20) has a free end (20A) that is provided in axial support against the core. The core has a plane end surface that forms a support surface, and a stop is arranged on the shaft.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de manoeuvre bistable (100), en translation, d'un arbre (20) mobile entre deux positions stables, comprenant un noyau (30) en matériau magnétique comportant un logement axial borgne (30A) qui s'étend sur une partie de la longueur dudit noyau et dans lequel est engagée une partie de l'arbre, des moyens de déplacement en translation dudit noyau et des moyens de déplacement en rotation (42,34) du noyau adaptés à provoquer une rotation du noyau d'un angle donné de façon concomitante à son mouvement de translation. Selon l'invention, l'arbre comporte une extrémité libre (20A) en appui axial contre une surface d'appui (30B) formée par la paroi de fond du logement axial du noyau (30), le contact entre ladite extrémité libre (20A) et ladite surface d'appui (30B) s'effectuant suivant une ligne circulaire.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/20 (2006.01); H01H 51/06 (2006.01); H01H 51/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/065 (2013.01); H01H 50/20 (2013.01); H01H 51/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845546 A2 20071017; EP 1845546 A3 20090107; EP 1845547 A2 20071017; EP 1845547 A3 20090107; FR 2899721 A1 20071012; FR 2899721 B1 20101105

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090708

2009-10-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-09-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU