Global Patent Index - EP 1845592 A2

EP 1845592 A2 2007-10-17 - Lamp mount and method for assembling the lamp mount

Title (en)

Lamp mount and method for assembling the lamp mount

Title (de)

Lampenfassung und Verfahren zur Montage der Lampenfassung

Title (fr)

Douille de lampe et procédé de montage de la douille de lampe

Publication

EP 1845592 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07005785 A

Priority

DE 102006017380 A

Abstract (en)

The socket has a main body (10), which consists of a lamp receiving part (20) and a connecting part (30). A contact area of the receiving contact element (21) or the connecting contact element (31) has one insulation piercing connection (40) with two insulation piercing connecting side pieces and other contact area is jammed between the two insulation piercing connecting side pieces of the insulation piercing connection. An independent claim is also included for a method for assembling a socket.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Fassung zur Aufnahme und Kontaktierung einer Glühlampe, umfassend einen Hauptkörper (10), welcher aus einem Lampenaufnahmeteil (20) und einem Verbindungsteil (30) besteht, wobei das Lampenaufnahmeteil (20) und das Verbindungsteil (30) miteinander verbunden und so angeordnet sind, dass ihre Achsen einen Winkel größer 0° und kleiner 180°, vorzugsweise 90°, einschließen. Dabei ist in dem Lampenaufnahmeteil (20) mindestens ein Aufnahmekontaktelement (21;21') und in dem Verbindungsteil (30) mindestens ein Verbindungskontaktelement (31;31') eingefügt, wobei zwischen einem Kontaktbereich (22;22') des Aufnahmekontaktelementes (21;21') und einem Kontaktbereich (32;32') des Verbindungskontaktelementes (31;31') ein elektrischer Kontakt hergestellt ist. Ein Kontaktbereich (22;22',32;32') des Aufnahmekontaktelementes (21;21') oder des Verbindungskontaktelementes (31;31') weist mindestens eine Schneidklemme (40) mit zwei Schneidklemmenschenkeln (41;41') auf und der jeweils andere Kontaktbereich (22;22',32;32')ist zwischen die beiden Schneidklemmenschenkel (41;41') eingeklemmt. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner ein Verfahren zur Montage der erfindungsgemäßen Lampenfassung.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/46 (2013.01); H01R 4/2429 (2013.01); H01R 43/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845592 A2 20071017; EP 1845592 A3 20090902; DE 102006017380 A1 20071025

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-05-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU