Global Patent Index - EP 1845643 A3

EP 1845643 A3 2007-10-31 - Radio

Title (en)

Radio

Title (de)

Radio

Title (fr)

Radio

Publication

EP 1845643 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07015293 A

Priority

  • EP 04764470 A
  • DE 10339537 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2005022790A1] According to the invention, it has been identified that a user of a radio receiver obtains text information significantly faster when a text information object contained in the radio signal and directly displayed on the display of the radio receiver contains a reference to another text information object in the radio signal, and the user can trigger the modification of the text information to be displayed, from the text information of the actual text information object, according to the text information of the text information object to which the actual text information object refers, by simple operation of a user selection device. The additional cost is thus strongly limited, as current radio receivers mostly have an "unengaged" button that only has an allocated function, and is thus occupied, in special operating situations of the radio receiver, and can, in this respect, be used as a user selection device. Due to the strong limitation of the available bandwidths of current radio systems for data services, codings that are as efficient as possible are used to generate the text information objects to be transmitted.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/40 (2008.01); H04H 60/25 (2008.01); H04H 60/27 (2008.01); H04H 60/46 (2008.01); H04H 20/86 (2008.01); H04H 20/93 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/40 (2013.01); H04H 60/25 (2013.01); H04H 60/27 (2013.01); H04H 60/46 (2013.01); H04H 20/16 (2013.01); H04H 20/86 (2013.01); H04H 20/93 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 2003110272 A1 20030612 - DU CASTEL BERTRAND [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0881792 A2 19981202 - ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC [JP]
  • [Y] "Digital Audio Broadcasting (DAB)", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, vol. BC, no. V111, August 2000 (2000-08-01), XP014006405, ISSN: 0000-0001

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2005022790 A1 20050310; AT 375641 T 20071015; AT 512514 T 20110615; CA 2537181 A1 20050310; CA 2537181 C 20131112; CA 2672277 A1 20050310; CA 2672277 C 20140708; DE 10339537 A1 20050324; DE 502004005230 D1 20071122; EP 1658689 A1 20060524; EP 1658689 B1 20110608; EP 1689104 A1 20060809; EP 1689104 B1 20071010; EP 1689104 B9 20080820; EP 1845643 A2 20071017; EP 1845643 A3 20071031; EP 1845643 B1 20120627; ES 2294754 T3 20080401; ES 2366553 T3 20111021; ES 2389976 T3 20121105; HK 1094488 A1 20080104; US 2006229056 A1 20061012; US 7590381 B2 20090915

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-11-30 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-07-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040825

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120825

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 564661 T

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120825

2013-07-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120927

2013-07-25 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502004013607

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-06-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-05-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2013-03-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-03-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121029

2013-01-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2013-01-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2013-01-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2013-01-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2013-01-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-12-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2012-11-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-11-05 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2389976 T3

- Effective date: 20121105

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-09-26 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-08-23 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502004013607

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-07-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2012-07-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 564661 T

- Effective date: 20120715

2012-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-06-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1658689 P

2012-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-06-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2012-01-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZINK, ALEXANDER

2012-01-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PROSCH, MARKUS

2012-01-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KORTE, OLAF

2012-01-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REICHENBAECHER, MICHAEL

2012-01-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KILIAN, GERD

2012-01-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JAUMANN, THOMAS

2012-01-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRUEHWALD, THOMAS

2012-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 60/47 20080101AFI20111130BHEP

2012-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 20/40 20080101ALN20111130BHEP

2012-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 60/25 20080101ALN20111130BHEP

2012-01-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BROADCAST TRANSMITTER FOR TRANSMITTING TEXT INFORMATION OBJECTS

2011-11-30 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502004013607

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04H0001000000

- IPC: H04H0060470000

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZINK, ALEXANDER

2008-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PROSCH, MARKUS

2008-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KORTE, OLAF

2008-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REICHENBAECHER, MICHAEL

2008-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KILIAN, GERD

2008-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JAUMANN, THOMAS

2008-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRUEHWALD, THOMAS

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-10-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1658689 P

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR