Global Patent Index - EP 1845752 A2

EP 1845752 A2 2007-10-17 - Radiant panel for the heating of environments

Title (en)

Radiant panel for the heating of environments

Title (de)

Plattenheizkörper für Räume Heizung

Title (fr)

Panneau radiant pour le réchauffement de l'environnement physique

Publication

EP 1845752 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07425197 A

Priority

IT VE20060022 A

Abstract (en)

In a panel (10) for the heating of environments comprising a radiant covering element (20) and film resistive heating means (30), said radiant covering element (20) is a stone or ceramic slab.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/00 (2006.01); H05B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/283 (2013.01); F24H 7/062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845752 A2 20071017; EP 1845752 A3 20081224; IT VE20060022 A1 20071012

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090625

2009-10-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-09-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2008-12-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU