Global Patent Index - EP 1845820 A2

EP 1845820 A2 2007-10-24 - CASSETTE ASSEMBLY AND UNIT DOSE MEDICATION CART USING THE CASSETTE ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

CASSETTE ASSEMBLY AND UNIT DOSE MEDICATION CART USING THE CASSETTE ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

KASSETTENANORDNUNG UND DIESE VERWENDENDER ED-MEDIKAMENTENWAGEN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE A CASSETTE ET CHARIOT A MEDICAMENTS A DOSE UNITAIRE FAISANT INTERVENIR L'ENSEMBLE A CASSETTE

Publication

EP 1845820 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06719982 A

Priority

  • US 2006003400 W
  • US 65052905 P
  • US 34306506 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006086182A2] [0094] A medication cart also holding at least one drawer or tray and at least one bin supported on the tray containing an array of drawers and bins, and a multilevel cassette assembly. An internal locking mechanism secures the cassette assembly when it is positioned in the medication cart, and an external locking mechanism secures the cassette assembly outside of the medication cart. In addition, the cassette assembly includes a mechanism that selectably provides access to an entire tray and all bins carried in it at one time or that provides access to single bins carried on the tray one at a time. This mechanism, more particularly, (a) permits a tray to be nearly fully withdrawn from the cassette assembly thereby exposing a major portion of all carried bins to access all of their contents, and (b) permits the tray to be only partially withdrawn from the cassette assembly so that only a minor portion is exposed but such that each bin can independently be removed from the tray one at a time to access its contents.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 46/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62B 3/006 (2013.01); A47B 47/05 (2013.01); A47B 67/04 (2013.01); A61G 12/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006086182A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006086182 A2 20060817; WO 2006086182 A3 20071101; CA 2597048 A1 20060817; EP 1845820 A2 20071024; JP 2008532580 A 20080821; US 2006220507 A1 20061005

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110802

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47B 46/00 20060101AFI20080115BHEP

2007-12-19 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070807

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU