Global Patent Index - EP 1845889 A1

EP 1845889 A1 2007-10-24 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DENTAL MODEL OCCLUSAL DETERMINATION USING A REPLICATE BITE REGISTRATION IMPRESSION

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DENTAL MODEL OCCLUSAL DETERMINATION USING A REPLICATE BITE REGISTRATION IMPRESSION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR OKKLUSALBESTIMMUNG AN EINEM ZAHNMODELL MIT EINEM REPLIKAT-BISSREGISTRIERABDRUCK

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES DE DETERMINATION OCCLUSALE DE MODELES DENTAIRES AU MOYEN D'UNE EMPREINTE D'ENREGISTREMENT DE MORSURE REPLIQUEE

Publication

EP 1845889 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05712789 A

Priority

US 2005003471 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006085851A1] Systems and methods for imaging a dental occlusal registration impression; developing a digital 3D surface contour model of the occlusal registration impression from the image data; electronically transferring the data representing the digital 3D surface contour model of the occlusal registration impression; fabricating a physical replicate of the occlusal registration impression; correlating features on upper and lower jaw dental models with features on the replicate occlusal registration impression model; and determining occlusal alignment of the upper and lower jaw dental models using the replicate occlusal registration impression model.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61C 19/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61C 19/05 (2013.01); A61C 9/0046 (2013.01); A61C 13/0013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006085851A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006085851 A1 20060817; CA 2597036 A1 20060817; EP 1845889 A1 20071024

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110507

2010-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101026

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IOS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070807

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR