Global Patent Index - EP 1845967 A2

EP 1845967 A2 2007-10-24 - A METHOD OF MODULATING T CELL FUNCTIONING

Title (en)

A METHOD OF MODULATING T CELL FUNCTIONING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION DER T-ZELLEN-FUNKTION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR MODULER LE FONCTIONNEMENT DE CELLULES T

Publication

EP 1845967 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06718328 A

Priority

  • US 2006001241 W
  • US 64450205 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006076580A2] A method of modulating T<SUB>H</SUB>1 cell functioning in a mammal, comprising administering to said mammal an effective amount of one or more IDO-mediated tryptophan metabolites or derivatives thereof; or an antagonist thereof.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/195 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07D 209/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/196 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006076580 A2 20060720; WO 2006076580 A3 20070712; AU 2006204871 A1 20060720; BR PI0605925 A2 20090526; CA 2594460 A1 20060720; CN 101232878 A 20080730; EP 1845967 A2 20071024; EP 1845967 A4 20080305; EP 2253313 A1 20101124; IL 184523 D0 20081229; JP 2008526983 A 20080724; KR 20070098916 A 20071005; ZA 200706751 B 20081029

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1105280

2011-02-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100828

2008-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/195 20060101AFI20070823BHEP

2008-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 37/00 20060101ALI20080116BHEP

2008-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 37/02 20060101ALI20080116BHEP

2008-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 37/04 20060101ALI20080116BHEP

2008-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 209/20 20060101ALI20080116BHEP

2008-02-06 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1105280

2007-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIO

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070814

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU