Global Patent Index - EP 1846117 A2

EP 1846117 A2 2007-10-24 - REPLACEABLE BLADE AND SPIKES FOR SNOW SHOE, AND SNOW SHOE PROVIDED WITH ONE SUCH BLADE AND SPIKES

Title (en)

REPLACEABLE BLADE AND SPIKES FOR SNOW SHOE, AND SNOW SHOE PROVIDED WITH ONE SUCH BLADE AND SPIKES

Title (de)

AUSTAUSCHBARE KUFE UND DORNEN FÜR SCHNEESCHUH UND SCHNEESCHUH MIT EINER SOLCHEN KUFE UND SOLCHEN DORNEN

Title (fr)

COUTEAU ET CRAMPON AMOVIBLES POUR RAQUETTE A NEIGE ET RAQUETTE EQUIPEE D'UN TEL COUTEAU ET D'UN TEL CRAMPON

Publication

EP 1846117 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 06709286 A

Priority

  • FR 2006000301 W
  • FR 0501548 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006085003A2] The invention relates to a blade (5) for a snow shoe (1), comprising a lower wall (3) with at least one region in which spikes (6) are to be fixed in a replaceable manner, said blade comprising locking means (50) for the assembly thereof and for locking the same to the snow shoe (1) in a replaceable manner. The inventive blade is characterised in that the locking means (50) are formed by at least one locking tongue (50) enabling the blade to be locked to the snow shoe (1) at least partially by means of a replaceable fixing element (6, 60) forming a complementary locking means (60), when said element (6, 60) is fixed to the lower wall (3) of the snow shoe in the same fixing region as the spikes (6).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 13/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006085003A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006085003 A2 20060817; WO 2006085003 A3 20070308; AT 471189 T 20100715; DE 602006014935 D1 20100729; EP 1846117 A2 20071024; EP 1846117 B1 20100616

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150209

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 471189 T

- Effective date: 20150209

2015-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602006014935

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120209

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2011-07-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602006014935

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 6

2011-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110317

2010-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2010-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006014935 P 20100729

2010-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2008-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080808

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-05-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070727

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI