Global Patent Index - EP 1846144 A1

EP 1846144 A1 2007-10-24 - DEVICE FOR THE CREATION OF THE LARGEST POSSIBLE INTERFACE IN ORDER TO CONTINUOUSLY AND VERY EFFICIENTLY MIX DIFFERENT FLUIDS IN GAS-LIQUID MIXTURES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR THE CREATION OF THE LARGEST POSSIBLE INTERFACE IN ORDER TO CONTINUOUSLY AND VERY EFFICIENTLY MIX DIFFERENT FLUIDS IN GAS-LIQUID MIXTURES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER GRÖSSTMÖGLICHEN PHASENGRENZFLÄCHE ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN UND HOCHEFFIZIENTEN DURCHMISCHUNG UNTERSCHIEDLICHER FLUIDE IN GAS-FLÜSSIGKEITS-GEMISCHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UNE SURFACE DE LIMITE DE PHASE AUSSI GRANDE QUE POSSIBLE POUR LE MELANGE CONTINU ET A HAUT RENDEMENT DE DIFFERENTS FLUIDES DANS DES MELANGES GAZ-LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1846144 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06706394 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000625 W
  • DE 102005003626 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102005003626A1] Apparatus for continuous mixing of fluids comprises an optionally heated or cooled mixing vessel under adjustable pressure; nozzle(s) for spraying liquid into the top of the container; a cone (optionally with an axial hole) below each nozzle and firmly connected to the nozzle at a defined spacing; tubes, open at the top and closed up to a hole in the bottom, below and aligned with each nozzle; and a liquid outlet below the tube in the base of the mixing vessel.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B01F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/0268 (2013.01); B01F 3/0473 (2013.01); B01F 15/06 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0427 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0431 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0481 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006079510A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005003626 A1 20060727; AT 396781 T 20080615; DE 502006000847 D1 20080710; EP 1846144 A1 20071024; EP 1846144 B1 20080528; ES 2306423 T3 20081101; WO 2006079510 A1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180115

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180201

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20161229 AND 20170104

2016-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-12-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20161123

2016-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Document: AT 396781 T

- Effective date: 20161006

2016-11-04 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-05 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

- Effective date: 20160819

2016-07-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

2016-07-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, 40789 MONHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 502006000847

2015-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 396781 T

- Effective date: 20140409

2014-03-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140206 AND 20140212

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH, DE

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE

- Document: DE 502006000847

- Effective date: 20130226

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE

- Document: DE 502006000847

- Effective date: 20130226

2013-04-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-02-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20130109

2013-01-02 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20121228

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2011-06-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081129

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090125

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100125

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080829

2010-05-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-04-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080828

2009-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 4

2009-02-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-02-27 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-02-27 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-01-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-01-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080828

2008-12-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080928

2008-11-28 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2008-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2306423 T3

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2008-09-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2008-08-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

2008-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006000847 P 20080710

2008-06-25 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070827

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR