Global Patent Index - EP 1846253 A2

EP 1846253 A2 2007-10-24 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTILAYER BODY AND CORRESPONDING MULTILAYER BODY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTILAYER BODY AND CORRESPONDING MULTILAYER BODY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTKÖRPERS SOWIE MEHRSCHICHTKÖRPER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN CORPS MULTICOUCHE ET CORPS MULTICOUCHE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1846253 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 06706766 A

Priority

  • EP 2006001126 W
  • DE 102005006231 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006084685A2] The invention relates to a method for producing a multilayer body (100) having a partially molded first layer (3m). The method is characterized in that a diffractive first relief structure having a high depth/width ratio of the individual structure elements, especially a depth/width ratio of > 0.3, is molded into a first area (5) of a replicating layer (3) of the multilayer body and the first layer (3m) is applied with a constant surface density to the replicating layer (3) in the first area (5) and in a second area (4, 6) in which the first relief structure is not molded into the replicating layer (3), and the first layer (3m) is partially removed depending on the first relief structure, so that the first layer (3m) is partially removed in the first area (5) or in the second area (4, 6) but not in the second (46) or in the first area (5).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/405 (2014.10); B42D 25/328 (2013.01); Y10S 359/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006084685A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006084685 A2 20060817; WO 2006084685 A3 20060928; AT 408524 T 20081015; CA 2596996 A1 20060817; CA 2596996 C 20130917; CN 100491134 C 20090527; CN 101166633 A 20080423; DE 102005006231 A1 20060824; DE 102005006231 B4 20070920; DE 502006001597 D1 20081030; DK 1846253 T3 20090119; EP 1846253 A2 20071024; EP 1846253 B1 20080917; ES 2314876 T3 20090316; JP 2008530600 A 20080807; JP 5068182 B2 20121107; PT 1846253 E 20081118; RU 2007133604 A 20090320; RU 2374082 C2 20091127; SI EP1846253 T1 20090228; US 2008310025 A1 20081218; US 7821716 B2 20101026

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20180130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP LT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-03-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-28 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20171208

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20170203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP LV] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170209

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20170201

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080917

2010-03-01 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E006639

2009-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-08-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090618

2009-05-29 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090117

2009-03-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2314876 T3

2009-01-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080403187

2008-12-16 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2008-12-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-11-18 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20081105

2008-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006001597 P 20081030

2008-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2008-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070728

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR