Global Patent Index - EP 1846314 A1

EP 1846314 A1 2007-10-24 - DRIVE SYSTEM OF AN ELEVATOR DOOR FROM WHICH THE POWER CURVE IS ADAPTED BASED ON THE AIR FLOW IN THE SHAFT.

Title (en)

DRIVE SYSTEM OF AN ELEVATOR DOOR FROM WHICH THE POWER CURVE IS ADAPTED BASED ON THE AIR FLOW IN THE SHAFT.

Title (de)

ANTRIEB FÜR EINE AUFZUGSTÜR MIT FAHRKURVE ANGEPASST AN DIE IM SCHACHT HERRSCHENDEN LUFTSTRÖMUNGEN

Title (fr)

ACTIONNEUR D'UNE PORTE D'ASCENSEUR AVEC COURBE DE PUISSANCE ADAPTÉE AU FLUX D'AIR DANS LA CAGE.

Publication

EP 1846314 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06700036 A

Priority

  • CH 2006000012 W
  • EP 05405010 A
  • EP 06700036 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006074563A1] The invention relates to a method for operating a lift installation (1), and to one such lift installation (1). The lift doors (4,6) are actuated by a door drive (22) according to a displacement curve. At least one sensor unit (10-12) detects pressure ratios and/or air flows. An evaluation unit (13) determines a displacement curve, from a plurality of displacement curves, which is optimum in terms of the detected pressure ratios and/or air flows.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/00 (2006.01); B66B 13/12 (2006.01); B66B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006074563A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006074563 A1 20060720; AT 458691 T 20100315; CA 2591931 A1 20060720; CA 2591931 C 20140408; CN 101098821 A 20080102; CN 101098821 B 20110601; DE 502006006237 D1 20100408; EP 1846314 A1 20071024; EP 1846314 B1 20100224; HK 1113919 A1 20100813; JP 2008526646 A 20080724; KR 101298284 B1 20130820; KR 20070095398 A 20070928; MY 144112 A 20110815; US 2009050416 A1 20090226; US 7946392 B2 20110524

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2013-06-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 458691 T

- Effective date: 20120910

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2013-02-20 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20120910

2013-02-20 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20120910

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110106

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006006237

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

- Effective date: 20101124

2010-08-13 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1113919

2010-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006006237 P 20100408

2010-02-26 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2010-02-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-10-17 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1113919

2008-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080708

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROTBOLL, ESBEN

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI