Global Patent Index - EP 1846456 A1

EP 1846456 A1 2007-10-24 - METHOD FOR SHAPING CELLULOSE ETHERS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SHAPING CELLULOSE ETHERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FORMGEBUNG VON CELLULOSEETHERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR FAÇONNER DES ETHERS DE CELLULOSE

Publication

EP 1846456 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06703567 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000528 W
  • DE 102005004893 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN101039961A] The invention relates to a method for producing cellulose ethers which have, compared to know cellulose ethers, a higher bulk density and a more even particle size distribution. Said method consists of pressing the cellulose ethers through a perforated plate.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08B 11/20 (2006.01); C08B 11/12 (2006.01); C08J 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 3/12 (2013.01); C08B 11/12 (2013.01); C08B 11/20 (2013.01); C08J 2301/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006081955A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005004893 A1 20060810; DE 102005004893 B4 20110210; BR PI0605928 A2 20090526; CN 101039961 A 20070919; CN 101039961 B 20100818; EP 1846456 A1 20071024; JP 2008528773 A 20080731; KR 20070101236 A 20071016; US 2006205935 A1 20060914; WO 2006081955 A1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130801

2011-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090916

2009-05-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DOW WOLFF CELLULOSICS GMBH

2008-03-05 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20070903

2008-03-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070903

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR