Global Patent Index - EP 1846464 A1

EP 1846464 A1 2007-10-24 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN AQUEOUS POLYMER DISPERSION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN AQUEOUS POLYMER DISPERSION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WÄSSRIGEN POLYMERDISPERSION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE DISPERSION DE POLYMERE AQUEUSE

Publication

EP 1846464 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06708007 A

Priority

  • EP 2006050653 W
  • DE 102005005493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2008132674A1] A process for preparing an aqueous polymer dispersion, in which, in an aqueous medium, in a first reaction stage, an aminocarboxylic acid compound is reacted in the presence of a hydrolase and of a dispersant, and, if appropriate, of an ethylenically unsaturated monomer and/or of a low water solubility organic solvent to give a polyamide and thereafter, in the presence of the polyamide, in a second reaction stage an ethylenically unsaturated monomer is free-radically polymerized.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 283/04 (2006.01); C08G 69/08 (2006.01); C08G 69/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 69/08 (2013.01); C08F 283/04 (2013.01); C08G 69/48 (2013.01); C12P 13/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08F 283/04 + C08F 212/08

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006082234A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005005493 A1 20060810; CN 101115777 A 20080130; EP 1846464 A1 20071024; JP 2008528784 A 20080731; US 2008132674 A1 20080605; WO 2006082234 A1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100829

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08F 283/04 20060101AFI20100305BHEP

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08G 69/08 20060101ALI20100305BHEP

2010-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08G 69/48 20060101ALI20100305BHEP

2008-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080623

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF SE

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070904

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR