Global Patent Index - EP 1846604 A1

EP 1846604 A1 2007-10-24 - FLAME RESISTANT FABRIC USEFUL AS A BATTING IN MATTRESSES AND UPHOLSTERY

Title (en)

FLAME RESISTANT FABRIC USEFUL AS A BATTING IN MATTRESSES AND UPHOLSTERY

Title (de)

FLAMMFESTES VLIES ALS WATTE FÜR MATRATZEN UND POLSTERMÖBEL

Title (fr)

TISSU ININFLAMMABLE UTILE EN TANT QUE COUCHE OUATEE DANS DES MATELAS ET REMBOURRAGES

Publication

EP 1846604 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06719131 A

Priority

  • US 2006002167 W
  • US 4721105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2006172649A1] Flame resistant fabrics useful as battings such as in mattresses and upholstery contain cellulose fibers (which retain at least 10 percent of their weight when heated in air to 700° C. at a rate of 20° C. per minute) and animal wool.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 31/001 (2013.01); D04H 1/425 (2013.01); D04H 1/4266 (2013.01); D04H 1/4382 (2013.01); Y10T 442/696 (2015.04); Y10T 442/697 (2015.04); Y10T 442/698 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006083593A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 2006172649 A1 20060803; BR PI0606552 A2 20090630; CA 2596072 A1 20060810; CN 101155954 A 20080402; EP 1846604 A1 20071024; JP 2008530378 A 20080807; KR 20070100822 A 20071011; MX 2007009002 A 20070918; US 2009083910 A1 20090402; WO 2006083593 A1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101206

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-03-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070806

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL