Global Patent Index - EP 1846617 A1

EP 1846617 A1 2007-10-24 - Level crossing

Title (en)

Level crossing

Title (de)

Schienengleicher Bahnübergang

Title (fr)

Passage à niveau

Publication

EP 1846617 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06701532 A

Priority

  • AT 2006000041 W
  • AT 2132005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006084297A1] The invention relates to a level crossing (1) over one or several tracks (2, 3) comprising a practicable traffic surface (4) consisting of cover elements (6,7). The cover elements (6) which are placed between rails (10, 11) of each track are supported by the rails only and bridge a space (12) between the rails (10, 11) in a cantilever manner. The cover elements (7) adjacently placed outside of the rails (10, 11) of each track are supported with the edge thereof (9) on the rail side by the corresponding rail (10, 11) and by foundations (14) on the side opposite to said rail. In the level crossing (1) area, the rails (10, 11) are places and fixed to girders (15, 16; 15a, 15b, 16a, 16b) arraigned along the rails in such a way that they pass thereunder and are placed on a ballast (19). Outside of the level crossing (1), the rails (10, 11) are placed on traverse sleepers (20).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/04 (2006.01); E01B 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006084297A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006084297 A1 20060817; AT 418647 T 20090115; AT 8456 U1 20060815; AU 2006212686 A1 20060817; AU 2006212686 B2 20110303; CA 2596899 A1 20060817; CA 2596899 C 20110125; CN 101115881 A 20080130; CN 101115881 B 20100623; DE 502006002433 D1 20090205; DK 1846617 T3 20090414; EP 1846617 A1 20071024; EP 1846617 B1 20081224; ES 2317485 T3 20090416; HR P20090145 T3 20090430; JP 2008530394 A 20080807; JP 4786665 B2 20111005; KR 20070114355 A 20071203; MA 29251 B1 20080201; PT 1846617 E 20090217; RS 50723 B 20100831; SI 1846617 T1 20090630; TN SN07243 A1 20081121; TW 200639295 A 20061116

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP LV] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Payment date: 20180112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20180117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20180205

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20180112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20180115

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20180112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20180118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180115

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180207

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP LT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Payment date: 20180117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20180202

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20180117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180131

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-08-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006002433

- Representative's name: KLUNKER IP PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081224

2009-12-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090925

2009-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-08-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090424

2009-08-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E005450

2009-06-30 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2317485 T3

2009-04-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-04-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090400643

2009-04-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-02-25 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2009-02-17 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090210

2009-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002433 P 20090205

2009-02-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG

2008-12-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA HR MK YU

2008-12-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-08-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LEVEL CROSSING

2008-05-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070808

- Countries: BA

2008-05-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070808

- Countries: HR

2008-05-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070808

- Countries: MK

2008-05-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070808

- Countries: YU

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070808

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA HR MK YU