Global Patent Index - EP 1846620 A2

EP 1846620 A2 2007-10-24 - A WATER DETENTION SYSTEM INCORPORATING A COMPOSITE DRAINAGE MEMBRANE

Title (en)

A WATER DETENTION SYSTEM INCORPORATING A COMPOSITE DRAINAGE MEMBRANE

Title (de)

WASSERRÜCKHALTESYSTEM MIT EINER VERBUNDDRAINAGEMEMBRAN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RETENUE POUR L'EAU COMPRENANT UNE MEMBRANE FILTRANTE COMPOSITE

Publication

EP 1846620 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06709711 A

Priority

  • GB 2006000474 W
  • GB 0502861 A
  • GB 0516866 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006085095A2] A water detention system comprises a sub-base of crushed rock or stone (21) overlying an impermeable layer (29) which may be naturally-occurring, as in an impermeable sub-grade, or may be formed by an impermeable membrane (26) laid over the sub-grade prior to the sub-base layer. Over the sub-base layer is an incompletely impermeable layer (22) the impermeability of which is compromised by openings in the form of slits (12) or by spacing between adjacent strips forming the layer. These openings allow water to percolate downwardly through the layer (22) into the sub-base, but substantially inhibit the escape of moisture by evaporation thereby serving to retain the collected water. Above the incompletely impermeable layer (22) may be a laying course (20) of finer particulate material such as pea gravel over which may be laid a wear surface (18) of slabs or blocks (19) to form an area for traffic, such as a roadway or parking area.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 5/00 (2006.01); E01C 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 3/06 (2013.01); E01F 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006085095A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006085095 A2 20060817; WO 2006085095 A3 20061228; AU 2006212015 A1 20060817; AU 2006212015 B2 20110908; CA 2597382 A1 20060817; CA 2597382 C 20151013; EP 1846620 A2 20071024; GB 0602831 D0 20060322; GB 2424617 A 20061004; GB 2424617 B 20110126; NZ 556691 A 20101029; US 2008003059 A1 20080103

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110408

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HANSON BUILDING PRODUCTS LTD

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070828

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR