Global Patent Index - EP 1846630 A1

EP 1846630 A1 2007-10-24 - WEB OR SLAB-SHAPED DRAINAGE MATERIAL FOR LAYING DRAINING AND/OR VENTILATING SLABSTONE PAVINGS IN A THIN MORTAR BED

Title (en)

WEB OR SLAB-SHAPED DRAINAGE MATERIAL FOR LAYING DRAINING AND/OR VENTILATING SLABSTONE PAVINGS IN A THIN MORTAR BED

Title (de)

DRAINAGE-BAHN- ODER PLATTENMATERIAL ZUR ENTWAESSERNDEN UND/ODER ENTLUEFTENDEN VERLEGUNG VON PLATTENBELAEGEN IM DUENNBETT

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE VOIE DE DRAINAGE OU DE DALLAGE POUR LA POSE SUR COUCHE MINCE DE DALLES POUR L'ASSECHEMENT OU LA VENTILATION

Publication

EP 1846630 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06706632 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000970 W
  • DE 202005001965 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006084637A1] The invention relates to a web or slab-shaped drainage material (10; 10') for laying draining and/or ventilating slabstone pavings (40) that are exposed to the effects of the weather outdoors in a mortar or glue layer (38) applied in a thin layer. The drainage material comprises an intrinsically rigid liquid-impermeable plastic support film (12) having a flat base from which a plurality of projections (16) having substantially plane faces forming the bases of the projections and being regularly or irregularly distributed across the base area are formed. A glass lattice material is used as a reinforcing structure for the mortar or glue layer (38) fixating the slabstone pavings (40) on the web or slab-shaped material. The projections project, when the material is laid in the prescribed position, towards the paving (40) to be applied, while pointing away from the underside of the base (14) of the support film (12) facing the soil. The glass lattice material (32) is provided on the flat sides of the faces (28) of the projections (16) facing away from the soil. A fleece material (30) is provided in the space left between the projections below the glass lattice material (32) and above the flat base (14) of the support film (12) and allows the mortar which is still flowable when the paving is laid to pass through.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 11/02 (2006.01); E04D 11/00 (2006.01); E04D 13/04 (2006.01); E04F 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0477 (2013.01); E04D 11/005 (2013.01); E04D 11/02 (2013.01); E04F 15/18 (2013.01); E04F 15/182 (2013.01); E04F 15/185 (2013.01); E04F 15/186 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006084637A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 202005001965 U1 20060614; AT 438772 T 20090815; DE 502006004440 D1 20090917; DK 1846630 T3 20091214; EP 1846630 A1 20071024; EP 1846630 B1 20090805; ES 2330562 T3 20091211; WO 2006084637 A1 20060817

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-09-18 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-04-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170324 AND 20170330

2017-03-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ARDEX ANLAGEN GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 438772 T

- Effective date: 20170202

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-05-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-04-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ARDEX ANLAGEN GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20160224

2016-02-24 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: ARDEX ANLAGEN GMBH; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: WALTER GUTJAHR

- Effective date: 20151022

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-10-08 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ARDEX ANLAGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20151002

2015-09-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ARDEX ANLAGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GUTJAHR, WALTER, 64404 BICKENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 502006004440

2015-09-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006004440

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE KATSCHER HABERMANN, DE

2015-08-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ARDEX ANLAGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GUTJAHR, WALTER, DE

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2012-09-28 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100206

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2012-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GUTJAHR, WALTER

- Free text: GUTJAHR, WALTER#PHILIPP-REIS-STRASSE 5-7#64404 BICKENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GUTJAHR, WALTER#PHILIPP-REIS-STRASSE 5-7#64404 BICKENBACH (DE)

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091106

2010-10-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100507

2010-05-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-04-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-04-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-03-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091105

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091205

2010-03-03 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-02-26 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-02-26 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-01-29 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091205

2010-01-29 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-01-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-12-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-12-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-12-11 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2330562 T3

2009-11-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2009-09-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006004440 P 20090917

2009-09-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-08-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-08-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071220

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070622

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR