Global Patent Index - EP 1846656 A1

EP 1846656 A1 2007-10-24 - ELECTRIC SEPARATION IN FUEL INJECTORS

Title (en)

ELECTRIC SEPARATION IN FUEL INJECTORS

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE TRENNUNG IN KRAFTSTOFFINJEKTOREN

Title (fr)

SEPARATION ELECTRIQUE DANS DES INJECTEURS DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1846656 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05823893 A

Priority

  • EP 2005056850 W
  • DE 102005004327 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102005004327A1] The injector has an injector body (110) with two functional units (148, 150) respectively including two electrically controllable valves, where the functional unit (150) is different from the functional unit (148). The functional units are reversibly connected by a non-positive connecting unit (152) and a positioning pin at a butt joint (126), and separately produced and tested, where the connecting unit has a coupling nut. An independent claim is also included for a method for producing a fuel injector.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 51/005 (2013.01); F02M 57/025 (2013.01); F02M 59/105 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0007 (2013.01); F02M 63/0015 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005004327 A1 20060803; EP 1846656 A1 20071024; EP 1846656 B1 20170412; US 2008121215 A1 20080529; US 7571715 B2 20090811; WO 2006081896 A1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502005015558

2017-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 884164 T

- Effective date: 20170515

2017-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-04-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-02-08 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170111

2016-12-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 57/02 20060101ALI20161031BHEP

2016-12-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 47/02 20060101ALI20161031BHEP

2016-12-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 63/00 20060101ALI20161031BHEP

2016-12-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 65/00 20060101AFI20161031BHEP

2016-12-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 61/16 20060101ALI20161031BHEP

2016-12-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 51/00 20060101ALI20161031BHEP

2016-12-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 59/10 20060101ALI20161031BHEP

2010-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100305

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR