Global Patent Index - EP 1846694 A1

EP 1846694 A1 2007-10-24 - A METHOD FOR REDUCING NITROGEN OXIDE EMISSIONS OF A BUBBLING FLUIDIZED BED BOILER

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR REDUCING NITROGEN OXIDE EMISSIONS OF A BUBBLING FLUIDIZED BED BOILER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON STICKOXIDEMISSIONEN EINES KESSELS MIT BLASENBILDENDEM WIRBELBETT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DESTINE A REDUIRE LES EMISSIONS D'OXYDE D'AZOTE D'UNE CHAUDIERE A LIT FLUIDISE BOUILLONNANT

Publication

EP 1846694 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06708960 A

Priority

  • FI 2006050056 W
  • FI 20055063 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006084954A1] A method for reducing nitrogen oxide emissions of a bubbling fluidized bed boiler burning biofuel and an air distribution system for a bubbling fluidized bed boiler biofuel. A fluidized bed (2) is arranged in the lower part of a furnace (1) of the bubbling fluidized bed boiler, which is fluidized by means of fluidizing gas, which comprises at least primary air. Fuel is fed to the fluidized bed (2), which dries and pyrolizes into pyrolysis gas comprising volatile matter of fuel, which gas rises upwards in the furnace and burns there. Secondary air is supplied above the fluidized bed (2) from secondary air nozzles (6), and tertiary air is supplied above the secondary air nozzles (6). A part of primary air is supplied in connection with fuel feeding in such a manner that the fuel is forced substantially on the surface of the fluidized bed (2), thus pyrolizing entirely, and at least a part of the pyrolysis gases formed in the pyrolysis is burnt by means of primary air in such a manner that the air coefficient in relation to the volatile matter of fuel in the pyrolysis gases is in the substoichiometric area.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 10/00 (2006.01); F23C 10/22 (2006.01); F23G 5/30 (2006.01); F23G 7/10 (2006.01); F23K 3/02 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

F23C (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 10/00 (2013.01); F23G 5/30 (2013.01); F23G 7/10 (2013.01); F23C 2201/101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006084954 A1 20060817; CA 2597159 A1 20060817; CA 2597159 C 20131022; EP 1846694 A1 20071024; EP 1846694 A4 20120104; EP 1846694 B1 20170510; FI 20055063 A0 20050211; FI 20055063 A 20060812; US 2008149012 A1 20080626

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20180213

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2018-02-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602006052494

2018-01-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2018-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2018-01-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2018-01-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2018-01-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-11-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170810

2017-11-30 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-11-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170910

2017-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-11-30 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-10-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170811

2017-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-10-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 892755 T

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-09-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2017-09-13 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20170510

2017-06-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2017-06-14 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602006052494

2017-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 892755 T

- Effective date: 20170515

2017-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-05-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-01-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161223

2016-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160429

2015-04-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALMET TECHNOLOGIES OY

2014-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALMET POWER OY

2012-01-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20111207

2012-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23C 10/00 20060101AFI20111201BHEP

2012-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23C 10/22 20060101ALI20111201BHEP

2012-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23G 5/30 20060101ALI20111201BHEP

2012-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23G 7/10 20060101ALI20111201BHEP

2012-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23K 3/02 20060101ALI20111201BHEP

2011-12-01 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602006052494

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F23C0010220000

- IPC: F23C0010000000

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DERNJATIN, PAULI

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FABRITIUS, MARKO

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROEPPAENEN, JUKKA

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070806

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR