Global Patent Index - EP 1846799 A2

EP 1846799 A2 2007-10-24 - ETENDUE EFFICIENT COMBINATION OF MULTIPLE LIGHT SOURCES

Title (en)

ETENDUE EFFICIENT COMBINATION OF MULTIPLE LIGHT SOURCES

Title (de)

BANDBREITENEFFIZIENTE KOMBINATION MEHRERER LICHTQUELLEN

Title (fr)

COMBINAISON A EFFACITE EN ETENDUE DE SOURCES DE LUMIERE MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 1846799 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06734567 A

Priority

  • US 2006004405 W
  • US 65107905 P
  • US 24016905 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006086458A2] A multi-colored illumination system comprising a beam combiner. The beam combiner comprises two triangular prisms and a filter for transmitting a first light and reflecting a second light, each light having a different wavelength. The beam combiner combines the transmitted first light and the reflected light to provide a combined beam. The six surfaces of each of the triangular prism of the beam combiner is polished, thereby combining the lights without increasing etendue of the multi-colored illumination system.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/12 (2006.01); G02B 5/04 (2006.01); G02B 27/09 (2006.01); G02B 27/14 (2006.01); H04N 9/31 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/0972 (2013.01); G02B 27/0905 (2013.01); G02B 27/102 (2013.01); G02B 27/145 (2013.01); G02B 27/149 (2013.01); H04N 9/3105 (2013.01); H04N 9/315 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006086458 A2 20060817; WO 2006086458 A3 20070816; CA 2594462 A1 20060817; EP 1846799 A2 20071024; EP 1846799 A4 20110126; KR 20070115882 A 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120821

2012-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120208

2011-01-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20101223

2011-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02B 27/12 20060101AFI20070821BHEP

2011-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02B 27/09 20060101ALI20101217BHEP

2011-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02B 27/14 20060101ALI20101217BHEP

2011-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02B 5/04 20060101ALI20101217BHEP

2011-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 9/31 20060101ALN20101217BHEP

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU