EP 1846845 A1 20071024 - PARAMETRICALLY MANAGED DATA OBJECTS
Title (en)
PARAMETRICALLY MANAGED DATA OBJECTS
Title (de)
PARAMETRISCH VERWALTETE DATENOBJEKTE
Title (fr)
OBJETS DE DONNEES A GESTION PARAMETRIQUE
Publication
Application
Priority
- GB 2006000318 W 20060131
- US 64935905 P 20050202
- US 70663005 P 20050809
IPC 8 full level
G06F 17/30 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G06F 16/284 (2018.12)
Citation (examination)
- FERNANDES A A A ET AL: "Extending a deductive object-oriented database system with spatial data handling facilities", INFORMATION AND SOFTWARE TECHNOLOGY ELSEVIER NETHERLANDS, vol. 41, no. 8, 15 June 1999 (1999-06-15), pages 483 - 497, ISSN: 0950-5849
- WEI LU ET AL: "Query evaluation and optimization in deductive and object oriented spatial databases", INFORMATION AND SOFTWARE TECHNOLOGY UK, vol. 37, no. 3, March 1995 (1995-03-01), pages 131 - 143, ISSN: 0950-5849
- ANONYMOUS: "Wikipedia: Polytope", 7 March 2011 (2011-03-07), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Polytope> [retrieved on 20110307]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
GB 2006000318 W 20060131; EP 06703933 A 20060131