Global Patent Index - EP 1846948 A2

EP 1846948 A2 2007-10-24 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR IMPROVED CHARGE MANAGEMENT FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL AND COLOR SENSING

Title (en)

METHODS AND DEVICES FOR IMPROVED CHARGE MANAGEMENT FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL AND COLOR SENSING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBESSERTEN LADUNGSMANAGEMENT FÜR 3D- UND FARBWAHRNEHMUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS DESTINES A LA GESTION DE CHARGE AMELIOREE DANS LA DETECTION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE ET DE COULEUR

Publication

EP 1846948 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06720322 A

Priority

  • US 2006004053 W
  • US 65091505 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006086281A2] TOF and color sensing detector structures have x-axis spaced-apart y-axis extending finger-shaped gate structures with adjacent source collection regions. X- dimension structures are smaller than y-dimension structure and govern performance, characterized by high x-axis electric fields and rapid charge movement, contrasted with lower y-axis electric fields and slower charge movement. Preferably a potential barrier is implanted between adjacent gates and a bias gate is formed intermediate a gate and associated source region. Resultant detector structures can be operated at the more extreme gate voltages that are desirable for high performance.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01C 3/08 (2006.01); G01C 3/00 (2006.01); G01J 9/00 (2006.01); G01S 7/08 (2006.01); G01S 17/36 (2006.01); G01S 17/89 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 31/02024 (2013.01); G01J 3/50 (2013.01); G01S 7/491 (2013.01); G01S 17/36 (2013.01); G01S 17/89 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006086281 A2 20060817; WO 2006086281 A3 20071129; EP 1846948 A2 20071024; EP 1846948 A4 20090909

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-26 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20131127

2013-11-27 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2011-04-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICROSOFT CORPORATION

2009-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091124

2009-09-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090810

2009-09-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 3/08 20060101AFI20080107BHEP

2009-09-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 3/00 20060101ALI20090804BHEP

2009-09-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01J 9/00 20060101ALI20090804BHEP

2009-09-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 7/08 20060101ALI20090804BHEP

2009-09-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 17/36 20060101ALI20090804BHEP

2009-09-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 17/89 20060101ALI20090804BHEP

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 3/08 20060101AFI20080107BHEP

2008-01-09 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20071129

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070727

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU