Global Patent Index - EP 1847034 A1

EP 1847034 A1 2007-10-24 - DEVICE FOR COUPLING A SIGNAL-TRANSMITTING AND/OR SIGNAL-RECEIVING UNIT TO A POWER SUPPLY LINE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR COUPLING A SIGNAL-TRANSMITTING AND/OR SIGNAL-RECEIVING UNIT TO A POWER SUPPLY LINE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANKOPPLUNG EINER SIGNALSENDE- UND/ODER SIGNALEMPFANGSEINHEIT AN EINE SPANNUNGSVERSORGUNGSLEITUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR COUPLER UNE UNITE D'EMISSION ET/OU DE RECEPTION DE SIGNAUX A UNE LIGNE D'ALIMENTATION EN TENSION

Publication

EP 1847034 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06705953 A

Priority

  • DE 2006000234 W
  • DE 102005006613 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006084452A1] The invention relates to a device (10) for coupling a signal-transmitting and/or signal-receiving unit (11) to a medium-voltage or high-voltage power supply line (12) by means of a coupler (15), particularly by means of an inductive coupler, for transmitting electrical signals over the power supply line, the signal-transmitting and/or signal-receiving unit being located at a distance from the coupler. The invention is characterized in that an active electronic component (16) is placed in the line path between the signal-transmitting and/or signal-receiving unit (11) and the coupler (15) while being located in the immediate vicinity of the coupler.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 3/54 (2006.01); H02J 13/00 (2006.01); H04B 3/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 3/56 (2013.01); H04B 3/542 (2013.01); H02J 13/0031 (2013.01); H04B 2203/5466 (2013.01); H04B 2203/5483 (2013.01); Y02E 60/7892 (2013.01); Y04S 40/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006084452A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006084452 A1 20060817; DE 102005006613 A1 20060824; EP 1847034 A1 20071024; ES 1061171 U 20060116

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140322

2013-05-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EICHHOFF KONDENSATOREN GMBH

2009-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090210

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR