Global Patent Index - EP 1847038 A1

EP 1847038 A1 2007-10-24 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON DATEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'EMISSION ET DE RECEPTION DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1847038 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06715827 A

Priority

  • KR 2006000374 W
  • KR 20050009670 A
  • KR 20050050368 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006083121A1] In a mobile communications system, a method of transmitting data corresponding to the same logical channel through two or more base stations, comprising: transmitting a first sub-packet generated by a first base station and a second base station based upon an encoded packet; and at a time point after the lapse of a certain time period from when the first sub-packet was transmitted, transmitting a second sub-packet generated by one of the first and second base stations based upon the encoded packet. When data corresponding to the same logical channel is broadcast from each base station that has respectively different channel environments, data transmission efficiency can be improved.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/24 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04W 4/06 (2009.01); H04W 16/12 (2009.01); H04W 16/14 (2009.01); H04W 28/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 1/1845 (2013.01); H04B 7/2656 (2013.01); H04L 1/0006 (2013.01); H04L 1/0002 (2013.01); H04L 1/1819 (2013.01); H04L 2001/0093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006083121 A1 20060810; AU 2006211764 A1 20060810; AU 2006211764 B2 20090528; BR PI0607099 A2 20090804; CA 2595357 A1 20060810; CA 2595357 C 20120626; EP 1847038 A1 20071024; EP 1847038 A4 20110831; HK 1113711 A1 20140912; IL 184767 A 20160229; IL 184767 D0 20071203; JP 2008529401 A 20080731; JP 4669009 B2 20110413; KR 101111515 B1 20140507; KR 20060088813 A 20060807; MX 2007009302 A 20070911; RU 2007132243 A 20090310; RU 2390097 C2 20100520; US 2006193351 A1 20060831; US 7653027 B2 20100126

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20141203

2014-12-03 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-08-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04B 7/24 20060101AFI20110726BHEP

2009-12-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LG ELECTRONICS INC.

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070824

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR