Global Patent Index - EP 1847078 A1

EP 1847078 A1 2007-10-24 - HANDLING INCOMING DATA

Title (en)

HANDLING INCOMING DATA

Title (de)

ABWICKLUNG ANKOMMENDER DATEN

Title (fr)

MANIPULATION DE DONNEES D'ENTREE

Publication

EP 1847078 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06704375 A

Priority

  • FI 2006050047 W
  • FI 20055046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006082284A1] So-called push technology enables reception of new contents automatically, i.e. without user initiation. In order to enable a connecting party to send data when a receiving application is not even running, and thus cannot receive the data, middleware simulating the application to a connecting party, and an active connection to the application by utilizing buffers is provided. More precisely, the middleware is arranged to buffer incoming (6-7) data on behalf of the application, if the application is not receiving the data, and to allow (6-12) the application to receive (6-13) the buffered data when the application is again willing to receive the data.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/56 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H04L (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/544 (2013.01); H04L 12/1859 (2013.01); H04L 12/1881 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006082284 A1 20060810; EP 1847078 A1 20071024; EP 1847078 A4 20100303; FI 20055046 A0 20050201

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161122

2015-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY

2014-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2010-03-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100128

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070822

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR