Global Patent Index - EP 1847097 A1

EP 1847097 A1 2007-10-24 - METHOD FOR INITIALIZING AN EXCHANGE OF SERVICES BETWEEN AT LEAST TWO PARTIES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR INITIALIZING AN EXCHANGE OF SERVICES BETWEEN AT LEAST TWO PARTIES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR INITIALISIERUNG VON EINEM LEISTUNGSAUSTAUSCH ZWISCHEN WENIGSTENS ZWEI PARTEIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR INITIALISER UN ECHANGES DE SERVICES ENTRE AU MOINS DEUX PARTIES

Publication

EP 1847097 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05821643 A

Priority

  • EP 2005012656 W
  • DE 102004061171 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006063672A1] The invention relates to a method for initializing an exchange of services between at least two parties, comprising transactions in relation to the acquisition of products and/or the utilization of services. According to said method, optical and/or acoustic information on at least one of the products of interest to the user of a mobile terminal and/or or least one of the services of interest to the user of a mobile terminal are acquired by means of a mobile terminal that is operated in a telecommunication network, preferably a mobile radio network. The acquired information is transmitted to a data processing system linked with the telecommunication network via a message service of the telecommunication network. The processing system determines additional information on the product of interest to the user of a mobile terminal and/or the service of interest to the user of the mobile terminal using the acquired information. The additional information so determined is at least partially transmitted to the mobile terminal of the user via a message service of the telecommunication network and is displayed by the mobile terminal.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/08 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 67/22 (2013.01); G06Q 40/00 (2013.01); H04L 67/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006063672 A1 20060622; DE 102004061171 A1 20060629; EP 1847097 A1 20071024; US 2007239578 A1 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20161220

2016-12-20 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2008-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080814

2008-03-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070302

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR