Global Patent Index - EP 1847114 A1

EP 1847114 A1 2007-10-24 - SERVICE PERSONALISATION IN A TERMINAL DEVICE

Title (en)

SERVICE PERSONALISATION IN A TERMINAL DEVICE

Title (de)

DIENSTPERSONALISIERUNG IN EINEM ENDGERÄT

Title (fr)

PERSONNALISATION DE SERVICE DANS UN DISPOSITIF TERMINAL

Publication

EP 1847114 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 05821697 A

Priority

  • EP 2005056977 W
  • FR 0500356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN101133634A] Two service signals are transmitted) from a service server (ISP) through a first network (RD in such a way that user's terminal devices display personalised service data items. When service signals (SD) are filtered, a terminal device (DI) extracts common data items accessible for several terminal devices and a parameter type from a service signal identified by a stored identifier. An end address(@Fj) is determined by applying a stored parameter related to the parameter type to a pre-recorded or transmitted algorithm. Said end address is transmitted, through a second network (RP), to an (ISP) server which transmits a first personalised file (FPj) associated with the end address and bearing personalised data items (DPj) displayed with the common data items (DC) in the device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); H04N 5/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 15/177 (2013.01); G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); H04N 21/4532 (2013.01); H04N 21/4622 (2013.01); H04N 21/6581 (2013.01); G06F 17/30029 (2013.01); G06F 17/30867 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 29/08072 (2013.01); H04M 3/42272 (2013.01); H04N 21/2668 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006074854A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2880716 A1 20060714; CN 101133634 A 20080227; CN 101133634 B 20130717; EP 1847114 A1 20071024; US 2009006584 A1 20090101; US 8856287 B2 20141007; WO 2006074854 A1 20060720

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151205

2015-12-05 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2011-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110511

2009-09-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEMALTO SA

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070711

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR