Global Patent Index - EP 1847188 A1

EP 1847188 A1 2007-10-24 - A device for the treatment of filter material used in tobacco products

Title (en)

A device for the treatment of filter material used in tobacco products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von in Tabakprodukten verwendeten Filtermaterialien

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement de matériau de filtre utilisé dans des produits du tabac

Publication

EP 1847188 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07106369 A

Priority

IT BO20060301 A

Abstract (en)

Filter tips for cigarettes are shaped and cut from continuous streams (F) of fibrous tow directed initially along respective feed lines (L) into a device (1) equipped with a rotary assembly (8) by which a flow of plasticizer fluid is generated and directed at the continuous streams (F) of fibrous material. Also forming part of the device (1) is an obstruction element (21) by which the flow of plasticizer fluid directed at the continuous streams (F) of fibrous material can be cut off in a controlled manner, so as to isolate the streams (F) during transients in operation of the device (1), typically when a malfunction or breakdown occurs.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/02 (2006.01); B05B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

DE 10354924 A1 20050630 - HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847188 A1 20071024; IT BO20060301 A1 20060721; JP 2007289190 A 20071108

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100219

2009-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091008

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071204

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU