Global Patent Index - EP 1847201 A2

EP 1847201 A2 2007-10-24 - Display unit

Title (en)

Display unit

Title (de)

Präsentationsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Présentoir

Publication

EP 1847201 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07106542 A

Priority

DE 102006018464 A

Abstract (en)

The device for presentation of goods and objects, with at least one vertical presentation surface (10), has main presentation surfaces (12) orientated radially or at least basically radially with regard to an enveloping contour of the device. The main presentation surfaces extend from a central pillar (14), the outer surface of which functions at least in sections as an additional presentation surface (16). A drive is provided for rotating the device and means of rotation are provided for rotatable bearing of the device.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Präsentationsvorrichtung (10) zur Präsentation von Waren und Gegenständen mit mindestens einer vertikalen oder zumindest im Wesentlichen vertikalen Präsentationsfläche (12), die in Bezug auf eine Hüllkontur (20) der Vorrichtung (10) radial oder zumindest im Wesentlichen radial ausgerichtet ist, bzw. sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/025 (2006.01); A47F 5/04 (2006.01); A47F 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847201 A2 20071024; EP 1847201 A3 20080521; DE 102006018464 A1 20071025

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-06-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081122

2009-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2008-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU