Global Patent Index - EP 1847204 A2

EP 1847204 A2 2007-10-24 - Dispenser of disinfection sheet products

Title (en)

Dispenser of disinfection sheet products

Title (de)

Spender für Desinfektionstücher

Title (fr)

Distributeur de produits de désinfection en feuille

Publication

EP 1847204 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07106395 A

Priority

IT BO20060309 A

Abstract (en)

A dispenser (1) of disinfection sheet products, comprises: a containment structure (2); at least one disinfectant product contained in a respective tank (3) housed in the containment structure (2); a disinfectant product dispensing element (4) associated with the disinfectant product tank (3); at least one magazine (5) for supports (6) in the form of sheets designed to receive the disinfectant product; means (9) for feeding the supports (6) along a feed path (P), for feeding the supports (6) from the inside of the containment structure towards the outside of it in such a way that the supports pass near to the disinfectant dispensing element (4) to receive a dose of disinfectant product; the dispenser (1) also comprises actuator means (10) for the disinfectant dispensing element (4) for dispensing the dose on the support (6) and a computerised control unit (12) associated with the disinfectant dispensing element (4), with the feed means (9) and with the actuator means (10) to synchronise them; the dispenser (1) also comprising identification means (13, 14, 15, 16) associated with the disinfectant product and with the support (6), the computerised control unit (12) being in communication with the identification means to cause the dispenser to operate according to the disinfectant product and support (6) sheets used.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/24 (2006.01); A47K 10/34 (2006.01); B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/32 (2013.01); A47K 2010/328 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847204 A2 20071024; EP 1847204 A3 20081008; IT BO20060309 A1 20071022; US 2008093373 A1 20080424

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090409

2009-07-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-06-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2008-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47K 10/24 20060101AFI20070810BHEP

2008-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47K 10/34 20060101ALI20080902BHEP

2008-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 35/00 20060101ALI20080902BHEP

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU