Global Patent Index - EP 1847205 A1

EP 1847205 A1 2007-10-24 - ROLL PAPER HOLDER

Title (en)

ROLL PAPER HOLDER

Title (de)

ROLLENPAPIERHALTER

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE ROULEAU DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 1847205 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05745300 A

Priority

  • CN 2005000643 W
  • CN 200520054104 U

Abstract (en)

Taught herein is a roll holder comprising a body and a shaft, the body comprising a left stop-plate, a right stop-plate, and a wall plate; a pair of symmetric to each other runners is disposed on the left stop-plate and the right stop-plate; the front portion of the runner is higher than the end portion thereof; both ends of the shaft are rotably or rollingly attached to the runners at both sides of the body, respectively; and a protrusion parallel to the shaft is disposed on the body. The invention overcomes disadvantages found in prior art, and provides a roll holder with the help of which rollable material may be cut or thorn using one hand only which makes the use very convenient. The solution uses a mobile shaft structure cooperating with a protrusion on the body and combining the slideway with the shaft.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/38 (2013.01); A47K 2010/3872 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847205 A1 20071024; EP 1847205 A4 20080611; CN 2768637 Y 20060405; HK 1083420 A2 20060630; US 2008308668 A1 20081218; WO 2006079259 A1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-06-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080515

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENG, XIAOFEI

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070825

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR