Global Patent Index - EP 1847305 A1

EP 1847305 A1 2007-10-24 - Apparatus and method for waxing skis or the like

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for waxing skis or the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Wachsen von Skiern o.ä.

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé pour farter des skis ou similaires

Publication

EP 1847305 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07007683 A

Priority

IT MI20060763 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention concerns a method and a device (1) for ski waxing. Advantageously the sole (S) and/or the ski wax (5) are heated with air to a high temperature. Scraping of the excess ski wax is performed hot on the liquid ski wax.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847305 A1 20071024; IT MI20060763 A1 20071015

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081210

2008-07-09 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20080417

2008-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080530

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080425

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU