Global Patent Index - EP 1847356 A2

EP 1847356 A2 2007-10-24 - Device with a support ring for extending feeder jets

Title (en)

Device with a support ring for extending feeder jets

Title (de)

Vorrichtung mit Stützring zum Ausziehen von Einspritzdüsen

Title (fr)

Dispositif doté d'une bague d'appui destiné à déloger des buses d'injection

Publication

EP 1847356 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07007463 A

Priority

DE 202006006421 U

Abstract (en)

Device for withdrawing an injection nozzle of a fuel injection system pressed into a cylinder head of an internal combustion engine comprises a support ring having ring sections provided with interlocking elements interlocking with a support cylinder (2) to prevent radial slippage of each ring section and simultaneous sliding of each ring section. Preferred Features: The interlocking elements consist of guiding pins which axially protrude into the support cylinder. The support ring has a larger inner diameter than the outer diameter of the assembly cylinder of the injection nozzle.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Ausziehen einer in einen Zylinderkopf einer Brennkraftmaschine eingepressten Einspritzdüse einer Kraftstoff-Einspritzanlage, bestehend aus einer Zugvorrichtung (3, 4, 8, 9) mit einem Stützzylinder (2), wobei zwischen dem Stützzylinder (2) und einem auf den Zylinderkopf (60) aufgesetzten Ventildeckel (63) ein separater, geteilter Stützring (7) vorgesehen ist, dessen Ringabschnitte (5, 6) im Umgebungsbereich der Einspritzdüse (40) einzeln auf den Ventildeckel (63) aufsetzbar sind, und wobei die auf dem Ventildeckel (63) aufliegenden Stützflächen (24, 25) der Ringabschnitte (5, 6) größer ausgebildet sind als die Stirnringfläche (15) des Stützzylinders (2), mit welcher sich der Stützzylinder (2) beim Ausziehvorgang axial auf dem Stützring (7) abstützt. Um Beschädigungen des Zylinderkopfdeckels sicher zu verhindern, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, dass die Ringabschnitte (5, 6) mit in den Stützzylinder (2) passend eingreifenden Formschlusselementen (32, 33, 34, 35) versehen sind, durch welche ein radiales Ausweichen des jeweiligen Ringabschnittes (5 bzw. 6) nach außen verhindert und gleichzeitig ein Verschieben des jeweils anderen Ringabschnittes (6 bzw. 5) radial nach innen begrenzt wird.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/0035 (2013.01); B25B 27/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006006421 U1 20060706; EP 1847356 A2 20071024; EP 1847356 A3 20090513

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091114

2010-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU