Global Patent Index - EP 1847468 A1

EP 1847468 A1 2007-10-24 - Tamper-evident closure

Title (en)

Tamper-evident closure

Title (de)

Originalitätsverschluss

Title (fr)

Fermeture anti-sabotage

Publication

EP 1847468 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07251601 A

Priority

US 40694406 A

Abstract (en)

A unitary, tamper-evident closure (21) for use on the threaded neck of a container (20) includes a molded plastic closure body (24) having a series of internal threads, an annular, tamper-evident band (23) constructed and arranged out of a suitable plastic for being ultrasonically welded to a portion of the container, and a plurality of frangible elements (25) constructed and arranged out of a suitable plastic for connecting the tamper-evident band to the closure body at a plurality of spaced-apart locations. The tamper-evident band is free of any undercut beads and the sole structural connection of the tamper-evident band to the container is by means of ultrasonic welding.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/3495 (2013.01); B65D 41/3409 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847468 A1 20071024; AU 2007201659 A1 20071108; CA 2584194 A1 20071019; US 2007267381 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091031

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080521

2008-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080221

2008-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, WAYNE L.

2008-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAVEAULT, RICHARD A.

2008-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRANDON, DAVID A.

2008-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STALIONS, STEPHEN E.

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU