Global Patent Index - EP 1847500 A2

EP 1847500 A2 2007-10-24 - Elevator alarm and management system

Title (en)

Elevator alarm and management system

Title (de)

Warnungssystem für Aufzüge und Managementsystem

Title (fr)

Alarme d'ascenseur et système de gestion

Publication

EP 1847500 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06425397 A

Priority

IT MC20060042 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention refers to an elevator alarm system, of the type comprising a central unit for alarm management and an alarm activation device provided with handsfree unit, in which the central unit is designed to be connected by telephone with a remote control station, characterised in that the alarm management central unit is provided with an internal modem and interfaced with the electronic board responsible for the elevator general management, in such a way that the operators of the remote station may interact with the alarm management central unit and with the electronic board for general elevator management purposes.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/0031 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847500 A2 20071024; EP 1847500 A3 20090520; IT MC20060042 A1 20071021

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091124

2010-03-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU