Global Patent Index - EP 1847626 A3

EP 1847626 A3 2007-10-31 - Magnesium alloys

Title (en)

Magnesium alloys

Title (de)

Magnesiumlegierungen

Title (fr)

Alliages de magnésium

Publication

EP 1847626 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07106312 A

Priority

JP 2006112941 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1847626A2] A casting heat-resistance Mg alloy improved in heat resistance without relying upon expensive RE contains Cu. More specifically, it contains Al (8.0 weight %), Cu (1.0-5.0 weight %), Zn (2.0 weight %), Be (0.01 weight %) and Mg (the rest). The alloy can be prevented from deteriorating in corrosion resistance by adjusting the added amount of Cu to 1.0-1.5 weight %. The corrosion resistance of the alloy can be improved more by adding 0.5 to 1.0 weight % Mn as well.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] JP 2005054233 A 20050303 - CHIBA INST TECHNOLOGY, et al
  • [Y] US 1743849 A 19300114 - GANN JOHN A
  • [Y] JP H0853722 A 19960227 - KOBE STEEL LTD
  • [Y] JP H06136480 A 19940517 - TOYOTA MOTOR CORP
  • [A] SPIEKERMANN P: "LEGIERUNGEN - EIN BESONDERES PATENTRECHTLICHES PROBLEM? - LEGIERUNGSPRUEFUNG IM EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMT -", MITTEILUNGEN DER DEUTSCHEN PATENTANWAELTE, HEYMANN, KOLN,, DE, 1993, pages 178 - 190, XP000961882, ISSN: 0026-6884
  • [A] GAO H T ET AL: "RECYCLING OF MAGNESIUM ALLOY AZ91 SCRAP BY A B2O3-CONTAINING FLUX", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, SPRINGER / BUSINESS MEDIA, DORDRECHT, NL, vol. 39, no. 21, 1 November 2004 (2004-11-01), pages 6449 - 6459, XP001501319, ISSN: 0022-2461

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847626 A2 20071024; EP 1847626 A3 20071031; AU 2007201703 A1 20071101; CA 2585318 A1 20071017; CN 101058860 A 20071024; JP 2007284743 A 20071101; KR 20070102952 A 20071022; NO 20071955 A 20071018; US 2008175744 A1 20080724

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080503

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU