Global Patent Index - EP 1847629 A2

EP 1847629 A2 2007-10-24 - Method for determining process parameters in a thermal spraying process

Title (en)

Method for determining process parameters in a thermal spraying process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung von Prozessparametern in einem thermischen Spritzprozess

Title (fr)

Procédé destiné à la détermination de paramètres de processus dans un processus de pulvérisation thermique

Publication

EP 1847629 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07102707 A

Priority

  • EP 06405169 A
  • EP 07102707 A

Abstract (en)

Method for determining process parameters in a thermal spraying process comprises using an operating model for the thermal spraying process consisting of an electromagnetic model and a fluidic model connected together. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) Thermal spraying device used in the above process; and (2) Computer program product for implementing the process.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren vorgeschlagen zur Bestimmung von Prozessparametern in einem thermischen Spritzprozess, bei welchem mittels einer thermischen Spritzvorrichtung (1) Partikel aufgeschmolzen oder plastisch gemacht oder verdampft werden und von einem Fluidstrom (G) zu einem Substrat (6) transportiert werden, bei welchem Verfahren für den thermischen Spritzprozess oder für die thermische Spritzvorrichtung ein Betriebsmodell errichtet wird, mit dem eine Simulation des thermischen Spritzprozesses durchführbar ist, und welches ein strömungsmechanisches Modell sowie ein elektromagnetisches Modell umfasst, wobei das strömungsmechanische Modell und das elektromagnetische Modell miteinander gekoppelt werden und mittels des Betriebsmodells mindestens ein Prozessparameter bestimmt wird.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 24/04 (2013.01); C23C 4/134 (2016.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847629 A2 20071024; EP 1847629 A3 20071107

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140517

2008-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080303

2007-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070802

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU