Global Patent Index - EP 1847647 A1

EP 1847647 A1 2007-10-24 - Air purifying panel

Title (en)

Air purifying panel

Title (de)

Luftreinigungspaneel

Title (fr)

panneau purificateur d'air

Publication

EP 1847647 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06112719 A

Priority

EP 06112719 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to an air purifying panel comprising a plurality of porous bodies (1) comprising a slag material (4) selected from the group consisting of blast furnace slag, steel slag and MSW/MSWI bottom ash and the use of said air purifying panel for removing noxious gases, dust and soot particles from the atmosphere.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/00 (2006.01); E01F 8/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/025 (2013.01); E03F 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847647 A1 20071024

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151103

2011-07-13 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110614

2011-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110606

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080424

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU