Global Patent Index - EP 1847651 A2

EP 1847651 A2 2007-10-24 - Method for reinforcing retaining walls

Title (en)

Method for reinforcing retaining walls

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Sicherung von Stützmauern

Title (fr)

Procédé de sécurisation de mur de soutènement

Publication

EP 1847651 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07007760 A

Priority

DE 102006018692 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves washing all loose components of a brickwork with water in static defined load distribution areas (2) lying at a distance. The washed brick cross section and a retaining wall (1) is completely pressed by paste like mortar. A nailing bore (7) is implemented with static defined length in each load distribution area through the retaining wall in the in-situ soil (8) and rock. The nailing bore is placed as a peg (9) and is fixed in the load distribution area and in the soil and rock by pressing in form fit manner.

Abstract (de)

Die Sicherung von Stützmauern durch Erdvernagelung in dem hinter der Stützmauer anstehenden Erdreich oder Fels erfolgt durch die Verfahrensachritte: a) in statisch definierten, im Abstand zueinander liegenden Lastverteilungsbereichen (2) werden alle losen Bestandteile des Mauerwerks mit Wasser ausgespült; b) der ausgespülte Mauerquerschnitt der Stützmauer (1) wird mittels pastösem Mörtel vollflächig verpresst; c) in jedem Lastverteilungsbereich (2) wird jeweils eine Nagelbohrung (7) mit statisch definierter Länge durch die Stützmauer (1) in das dahinter anstehende Erdreich (8) und/oder Fels ausgeführt; d) in die Nagelbohrung (7) wird ein Erdnagel (9) eingebracht und durch Verpressen kraftschlüssig im Lastverteilungsbereich und im Erdreich (8) und/oder Fels verankert.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/0233 (2013.01); E02D 35/00 (2013.01); E02D 37/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847651 A2 20071024; EP 1847651 A3 20100721; DE 102006018692 A1 20071025

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-17 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20110122

2011-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100122

2011-03-30 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2010-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-02-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSS, KURT G. DIPL-ING.

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU