Global Patent Index - EP 1847657 A1

EP 1847657 A1 2007-10-24 - Sealed device for installing toilet stool

Title (en)

Sealed device for installing toilet stool

Title (de)

Abgedichtete Vorrichtung zum Montieren einer Toilettenschüssel

Title (fr)

Dispositif étanchéifié pour installer une cuvette de WC

Publication

EP 1847657 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06112816 A

Priority

EP 06112816 A

Abstract (en)

A sealed device for installing a toilet stool on the floor surface includes a sealed body and a plurality of ears protruded from the outer periphery of the sealed body. Said sealed body is made of ductile material and is fastenably mounted on the locating member by ears. The sealed body includes a central opening that served as an access between the inlet port of the drainage pipe and drainage trap outlet port of the toilet stool. By the means of the sealed device, the toilet stool is capable of being installed more rapidly and conveniently and prevents occurrence of sewage leakage.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847657 A1 20071024

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2008-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEE TSAI FA

2008-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEE, FENG CHIU YING

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEE TSAI FA

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEE, FENG CHIU YING

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU